Financial history AMAZING GRAZE

Charity number: 1167233
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £46.38k £143.40k £149.88k £193.35k £109.63k
Total expenditure £35.69k £143.41k £126.42k £217.66k £129.89k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A