AMAZING GRAZE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To relieve poverty particularly but not exclusively amongst homeless people in Blackpool and the surrounding areas
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Blackpool
Governance
- 20 May 2016: Standard registration
- AG (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ABBIE BUTCHER | Chair | 20 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
Julia Brown | Trustee | 14 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
RACHEL WALMSLEY | Trustee | 15 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Lee Martyn Kelshaw | Trustee | 27 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Danielle Ferrar | Trustee | 02 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Louie Butcher | Trustee | 28 January 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £46.38k | £143.40k | £149.88k | £193.35k | £109.63k | |
|
Total expenditure | £35.69k | £143.41k | £126.42k | £217.66k | £129.89k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 17 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 17 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 08 February 2023 | 8 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 08 February 2023 | 8 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 19 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 19 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 09 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 09 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 19 MAY 2016
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE POVERTY PARTICULARLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY AMONGST HOMELESS PEOPLE IN BLACKPOOL AND THE SURROUNDING AREAS IN SUCH WAYS AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL THINK FIT INCLUDING THE PROVISION OF A MEAL AND HOT DRINK; FACILITIES FOR WASHING AND SUPPORT OR SIGNPOSTING TO RELEVANT INFORMATION AND OTHER ADVISORY SERVICES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Amazing Graze
44 Bolton Street
BLACKPOOL
FY1 6AA
- Phone:
- 07486312106
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window