CAMBRIDGE ALLIANCE CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
TO ADVANCEMENT OF CHRISTIAN FAITH BY PREACHING AND TEACHING THE GOSPEL OF JESUS CHRIST, INCLUDING SUNDAY SERVICE (WORSHIP), CHILDREN'S SUNDAY SCHOOL, BAPTISM/WEDDING/MEMORIAL SERVICE, BIBLE STUDY GROUPS, ENGLISH COURSE FOR CHINESE VISITING SCHOLARS, SEMINARS, VISIT MUSEUM, NATIONAL GALLERY AND PARLIAMENT, PARENTING CLASS, CHINESE CLASS, DRAWING AND ARTS CLASS FOR CHILDREN, SUMMER CAMP, ETC
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
70 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Cambridgeshire
Governance
- 15 April 2016: CIO registration
No other names
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Qi Wang | Chair | 01 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Xiaowen LIU | Trustee | 01 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Grace Wang | Trustee | 26 January 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £35.41k | £15.97k | £58.99k | £101.26k | £165.51k | |
|
Total expenditure | £28.21k | £16.11k | £27.08k | £59.84k | £91.33k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 15 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 15 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 03 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 03 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 21 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 21 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 30 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 30 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Association Registered 15 Apr 2016
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH BY PREACHING AND TEACHING THE GOSPEL OF JESUS CHRIST AS SET FORTH IN THE HOLY SCRIPTURES AND MAKING OF DISCIPLES FOR JESUS CHRIST, PRIMARILY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY AMONG THE CHINESE COMMUNITY IN CAMBRIDGE AND THE SURROUNDING AREAS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
St. James Church
Wulfstan Way
CAMBRIDGE
CB1 8QJ
- Phone:
- 07521687616
- Email:
- wenqian.qiu@caccam.org.uk
- Website:
-
caccam.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window