Financial history RACIAL JUSTICE NETWORK

Charity Number: 1165804
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £12.76k £213.68k £203.30k £281.47k £326.15k
Total expenditure £13.74k £107.19k £104.10k £222.19k £354.20k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A