MUSIC FOR HOPE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Music For Hope is a community music project that provides music tuition to young people in the Bajo Lempa, El Salvador to give opportunity and encourage solidarity.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Liverpool City
- Manchester City
- El Salvador
Governance
- 08 June 2016: CIO registration
- MFH (Working name)
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Emily Mcindoe | Trustee | 21 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sophie Elizabeth Helsby | Trustee | 06 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
CORNELIA GRAEBNER | Trustee | 01 June 2016 |
|
|
||||
KATHERINE GIRLING ROGERS | Trustee | 01 June 2016 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW REDDEN | Trustee | 01 June 2016 |
|
|
||||
LUCIE PHILLIPS | Trustee | 01 June 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.56k | £29.68k | £24.67k | £19.74k | £16.25k | |
|
Total expenditure | £26.22k | £22.42k | £28.70k | £29.12k | £6.36k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 21 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 21 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 23 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 23 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 23 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 23 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 25 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 25 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 24 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 24 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 08 Jun 2016
Charitable objects
1) TO ADVANCE IN LIFE AND RELIEVE NEEDS OF YOUNG PEOPLE IN THE BAJO LEMPA, EL SALVADOR, CENTRAL AMERICA THROUGH: (I) THE SUPPLY OF MUSICAL INSTRUMENTS, EQUIPMENT AND TUITION; AND (II) PROVIDING TRADITIONAL SALVADORAN MUSIC MAKING OPPORTUNITIES WHICH DEVELOP THEIR SKILLS, CAPACITIES AND CAPABILITIES TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY AS MATURE AND RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS. 2) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN BAJO LEMPA, EL SALVADOR, CENTRAL AMERICA ON THE SUBJECT OF TRADITIONAL SALVADORAN CULTURE. 3) TO FURTHER OTHER SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES UNDER THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES AS THE TRUSTEES SEE FIT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
23 FERNLEIGH AVENUE
MANCHESTER
M19 3LU
- Phone:
- 07515461362
- Email:
- musicforhopeuk@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window