Accounts and annual returns WAVEZ

Charity number: 1166632
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2020 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2019 30 January 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 30 January 2020 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2018 16 January 2019 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 23 January 2019 On Time