Financial history THE NETWORK CIO

Charity Number: 1167775
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £48.69k £62.64k £88.57k £61.66k £63.97k
Total expenditure £44.56k £50.88k £75.38k £85.42k £73.47k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £26.01k £26.00k £19.50k £23.74k £47.36k