UPP FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Charity's objects and principal activities are to enhance partnership and innovation in the higher education sector and within our communities by awarding grants and providing a platform for debate to: increase access and retention to higher education; improve employability; enhance civic universities; and, develop global citizens.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 01 April 2016: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Richard Bolger | Trustee | 28 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Juliana Quintero | Trustee | 28 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Matthew John Burton | Trustee | 31 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Richard Brabner | Trustee | 31 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTOPHER Skidmore | Trustee | 04 August 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £267.00k | £365.00k | £270.00k | £270.00k | £274.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £208.00k | £370.00k | £138.00k | £167.00k | £352.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 28 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | 28 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 17 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 17 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 12 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 12 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 31 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 31 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 20 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 20 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 23 DEC 2015
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CHARITY IS TO ADVANCE SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES (ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES) AS THE TRUSTEES SEE FIT FROM TIME TO TIME IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY ADVANCING EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
UPP Ltd
First Floor
12 Arthur Street
LONDON
EC4R 9AB
- Phone:
- 02073987200
- Email:
- compliance@upp-ltd.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window