Financial history Vigilance of Brixham

Charity number: 1168570
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/04/2020 30/04/2021 30/04/2022 30/04/2023 30/04/2024
Total gross income £8.15k £106.89k £37.66k £240.61k £558.41k
Total expenditure £14.45k £17.06k £31.85k £271.21k £622.21k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £5.00k £87.00k N/A £5.00k £548.39k
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A N/A N/A £553.40k
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £3.54k
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Endowments N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A N/A N/A £1.47k
Income - Other N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Legacies N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £622.21k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A N/A N/A £0