NORTH WALES MEDICAL TRUST LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We are an administrative charity involved in the training and support of medical organisations, their personnel and clients.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 11 April 1978: Standard registration
- NORTH WALES MEDICAL CENTRE CANOLFAN MEDDYDOL GOGLEDD CYMRU LADY FORESTERS LLANDUDNO LTD (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
RONALD SCOTT SMITH ACIB MIC | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Dr CARMEN MUNTEANU | Trustee | 10 December 2012 |
|
|
||||
Dr GWILYM SION PRITCHARD | Trustee | 10 December 2012 |
|
|
||||
DIANNE ROSEMARY GILL | Trustee | 06 December 2011 |
|
|||||
WYN THOMAS | Trustee | 06 December 2011 |
|
|
||||
Dr ROGER BARRINGTON RAMSAY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
CARLA BETTINA FORFAR | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £92.01k | £85.04k | £102.74k | £90.14k | £79.69k | |
|
Total expenditure | £127.61k | £135.63k | £134.53k | £125.27k | £136.32k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 117 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 117 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 21 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 23 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 05 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 08 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 23 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 09 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 03 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 30 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 3 MARCH 1978 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS 10 JANUARY 1985, 7 MARCH 1988 6TH FEBRUARY 1989 AND 5TH DECEMBER 1994 .
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE SICKNESS AND INFINITY BY PROVIDING AN ESTABLISHMENT AND ACCOMMODATION, ATTENTION, MEDICAL CARE, TREATMENT AND NURSING FOR SICK, ELDERLY, INJURED OR DISABLED PERSONS GRATUITOUSLY OR OTHERWISE ACCORDING TO THEIR MEANS. (FOR FURTHER DETAILS SEE CLAUSE 3 OF THE MEMORANDUM AF ASSOCIATION).
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
JOHN P FISHER
PARKIN S BOOTH LTD
2ND FLOOR
14 CASTLE STREET
LIVERPOOL
L2 0NE
- Phone:
- 01512364331
- Email:
- JPF@PARKINSBOOTH.CO.UK
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window