SHERIFF HUTTON VILLAGE HALL TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The provision of a facility for recreation, education and leisure for all the people of Sheriff Hutton civil parish.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2016
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- North Yorkshire
Governance
- 07 April 1978: Standard registration
- 24 February 2018: Removed (Transfer of funds)
- 24 February 2018: Funds transferred to 1169225 SHERIFF HUTTON VILLAGE HALL
- SHERIFF HUTTON NEW VILLAGE HALL TRUST - SHERIFF HUTTON VILLAGE HALL (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2012 | 31/12/2013 | 31/12/2014 | 31/12/2015 | 31/12/2016 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £35.76k | £31.70k | £30.05k | £31.11k | £28.80k | |
|
Total expenditure | £22.15k | £31.07k | £31.85k | £27.19k | £24.14k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2016 | 09 October 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2016 | 09 October 2017 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2015 | 08 September 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2015 | 08 September 2016 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2014 | 22 July 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2014 | 22 July 2015 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 2 MARCH 1978
Charitable objects
THE PROVISION OF A VILLAGE HALL FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISH OF SHERIFF HUTTON WITH, CORNBOROUGH IN THE COUNTY OF NORTH YORKSHIRE (HEREINAFTER CALLED "THE AREA OF BENEFIE) WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS INCLUDING USE FOR MEETINGS LECTURES AND CLASSES AND FOR OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS
Area of benefit
PARISH OF SHERIFF HUTTON WITH CORNBOROUGH
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window