SHALLAL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Promote, maintain, improve and advance education and to preserve and protect health particularly by providing access to and involvement in the performing arts including the arts of dance, theatre, music, visual arts, film, costume, photography, sculpture, writing and theatre technical skills by a wide range of the community, especially those who need a supportive environment.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
Total income includes £15,000 from 1 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Cornwall
Governance
- 07 April 2016: CIO registration
- 21 February 2017: Funds received from 1111497 SHALLAL
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
HENRIETTA MARY BOEX BA | Chair | 07 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
Mary Godwin | Trustee | 07 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Joy Tomos | Trustee | 05 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Nigel Arthur Pooley | Trustee | 11 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
NICHOLAS DAVID FRIPP | Trustee | 07 April 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £102.81k | £184.71k | £234.82k | £222.38k | £234.88k | |
|
Total expenditure | £78.01k | £123.07k | £234.65k | £234.82k | £261.07k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | £4.77k | N/A | £15.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 20 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 20 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 30 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 30 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 25 July 2022 | 25 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 25 July 2022 | 25 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 30 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 30 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 25 February 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 25 February 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Association Registered 07 Apr 2016
Charitable objects
OBJECTS. THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ("THE OBJECTS") ARE TO PROMOTE, MAINTAIN, IMPROVE AND ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PRESERVE AND PROTECT HEALTH, PARTICULARLY BY PROVIDING ACCESS TO AND INVOLVEMENT IN THE PERFORMING ARTS, INCLUDING THE ARTS OF DANCE, THEATRE, MUSIC, VISUAL ARTS, FILM, COSTUME, PHOTOGRAPHY, SCULPTURE, WRITING AND THEATRE TECHNICAL SKILLS BY A WIDE RANGE OF THE COMMUNITY, ESPECIALLY THOSE WHO NEED A SUPPORTIVE ENVIRONMENT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
7-9 High Cross Street
ST. AUSTELL
Cornwall
PL25 4AB
- Phone:
- 07442506065
- Email:
- admin@shallal.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window