NORFOLK ARCHIVES AND HERITAGE DEVELOPMENT FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Norfolk Archives and Heritage Development Foundation provides funding to support; 1. Purchase of Norfolk's archives, so they can be made accessible to all. 2. Preservation of Norfolk's archives, namely storage, active conservation and digitisation. 3. Engagement activities linked to the above and other archives.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

10 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Norfolk
Governance
- 23 May 2016: CIO registration
- 22 August 2022: Funds received from 800742 FEDERATION OF NORFOLK HISTORICAL AND ARCHAEOLOGICA...
- NORAH (Working name)
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Natalie Elizabeth Butler | Chair | 22 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Brian James Horner | Trustee | 22 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Alan Charles Steynor | Trustee | 22 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Christopher John KEMP | Trustee | 22 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Helen Marie Green | Trustee | 22 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
India Marilyn Sowe | Trustee | 22 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr John Richard Alban | Trustee | 22 September 2023 |
|
|||||
Peter Robert Williams CBE | Trustee | 22 September 2023 |
|
|||||
Julian Matthew White | Trustee | 22 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL JOHN BAYLIS CHENERY OF HORSBRUGH | Trustee | 10 September 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £21.46k | £2.31k | £1.63k | £6.58k | £5.36k | |
|
Total expenditure | £13.60k | £48 | £5.01k | £12.17k | £1.61k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 21 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 21 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 27 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 27 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 30 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 28 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 14 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 14 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 23 May 2016
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS (1) ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, IN THE HISTORY OF NORFOLK BY WORKING IN CONJUNCTION WITH THE NORFOLK RECORD OFFICE AND ITS PARTNER ORGANISATIONS, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY FUNDING; (A) THE ACQUISITION, PRESERVATION AND PROCESSING OF RECORDS AND PRINTED MATERIALS WORTHY OF PERMANENT RETENTION SO THEY CAN BE MADE ACCESSIBLE TO THE PUBLIC BY THE NORFOLK RECORD OFFICE AND ITS PARTNER ORGANISATIONS, (B) PROJECTS AND ACTIVITIES WHICH ENGAGE DIFFERENT AUDIENCES WITH RECORDS AND PRINTED MATERIALS WORTHY OF PERMANENT RETENTION. NOTHING IN THIS CONSTITUTION SHALL AUTHORISE AN APPLICATION OF THE PROPERTY OF THE CIO FOR THE PURPOSES WHICH ARE NOT CHARITABLE IN ACCORDANCE WITH SECTION 7 OF THE CHARITIES AND TRUSTEE INVESTMENT (SCOTLAND) ACT 2005 AND SECTION 2 OF THE CHARITIES ACT (NORTHERN IRELAND) 2008.
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Archive Centre
County Hall
Martineau Lane
Norwich
NR1 2DQ
- Phone:
- 01603222003
- Email:
- enquiries@norah-df.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window