YOUNG PEOPLE'S PUPPET THEATRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity runs puppet projects for the benefit of young people, teaching them artistic, technical and performance skills, and causing their self confidence and ability to operate within a team to be strengthened.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Throughout England
Governance
- 19 February 2016: Standard registration
- YPPT (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Nisha Allen | Trustee | 21 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Beverley Koranteng-Aitkins | Trustee | 04 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Piggott | Trustee | 17 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Cooper | Trustee | 15 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rosemary Mathews | Trustee | 15 February 2023 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £70.40k | £51.05k | £63.57k | £140.15k | £147.88k | |
|
Total expenditure | £59.79k | £53.11k | £65.44k | £107.01k | £133.19k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 25 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 25 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 19 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 19 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 20 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 20 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 29 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 29 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 15 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 15 May 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 15 APR 2015
Charitable objects
3.1 THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE: 3.1.1 TO ADVANCE EDUCATION, IN PARTICULAR THROUGH THE PROVISION OF TRAINING, MATERIALS AND OTHER SUPPORT FOR EDUCATIONAL PUPPET-MAKING AND PRODUCTION OF PUPPET SHOWS, PLAYS AND THEATRICAL PERFORMANCES; AND 3.1.2 THE ENCOURAGEMENT OF THE ARTS, IN PARTICULAR PUPPETRY, THEATRE, DRAMA, MIME, DANCE, SINGING AND MUSIC.
Area of benefit
THROUGHOUT ENGLAND
Contact information
- Address:
-
Trestle Arts Base
Russet Drive
ST. ALBANS
Hertfordshire
AL4 0JQ
- Phone:
- 07914830730
- Email:
- admin@yppt.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window