REFUGEE CONNECTION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We invite local Londoners and refugees to join our network and get to know each other, outside of the traditional charitable dynamic of volunteers and service users, at our cafe garden socials, table tennis, walks and more.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2018
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Human Resources
- Throughout London
Governance
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2017 | 31/05/2018 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £40.01k | £15.55k | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.34k | £38.53k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2018 | 10 March 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2018 | 10 March 2019 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 May 2017 | 12 October 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 May 2017
(These accounts |
27 September 2017 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION REGISTERED 16 MAY 2016 AMENDED ON 27 FEB 2018
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE SOCIAL INCLUSION AMONGST PEOPLE GRANTED REFUGEE STATUS (AND ASYLUM SEEKERS AND DISPLACED PERSONS) AGED OVER 18 IN LONDON WHO DO NOT REGULARLY PARTICIPATE IN COMMUNITY LIFE AS THEY DO NOT HAVE LARGE OR STRONG NETWORKS OF FRIENDS AND FAMILY AROUND THEM; WHO ARE LONELY OR ISOLATED AND WHO ARE HAVING DIFFICULTY ACCESSING STATUTORY AND NON-STATUTORY SERVICES BECAUSE THEY ARE SUFFERING MENTAL AND PHYSICAL EFFECTS OF FORCED MIGRATION BY THE PROVISION OF: A. HOSTING, ORGANISING AND SIGNPOSTING TO EVENTS AND SOCIAL MEET-UPS WHICH BRING PEOPLE TOGETHER TO SHARE NEW EXPERIENCES AND BUILD FRIENDSHIPS. B. RUNNING AN ADVOCACY AND ADVICE SERVICE TO HELP REFUGEES, ASYLUM SEEKERS AND MIGRANTS ACCESS THEIR RIGHTS AND EASE THE BURDEN OF FORCED MIGRATION. C. SUCH OTHER ACTIVITIES AND/OR PROGRAMMES DEEMED APPROPRIATE AND VIABLE BY THE CHARITY’S LEADERSHIP. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN GENERAL ABOUT THE ISSUES RELATING TO REFUGEES AND THOSE SEEKING ASYLUM.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window