Accounts and annual returns MAKING LIGHT

Charity number: 1165877
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 03 March 2019 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 03 March 2019 Not submitted
Annual return 03 March 2018 18 December 2018 On Time
Accounts and TAR 03 March 2018 18 December 2018 On Time
Annual return 05 April 2017 01 December 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2017 25 September 2017 On Time