THE PLANTATION GARDEN PRESERVATION TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The restoration and preservation, for the public benefit, of the Gardens at 4 Earlham Road, Norwich, known as The Plantation Garden.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
80 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Norfolk
Governance
- 04 February 2016: CIO registration
- 12 December 2016: Funds received from 801095 THE PLANTATION GARDEN PRESERVATION TRUST
No other names
- Financial Conduct Authority
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Joanna Mary Newman | Trustee | 08 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Mr IM Small | Trustee | 22 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
ROGER AMBROSE BROUSSON CONNAH | Trustee | 08 May 2014 |
|
|
||||
Valerie Linda Striker | Trustee | 24 March 2011 |
|
|
||||
SUSAN MARY BELL | Trustee | 26 March 2009 |
|
|
||||
PENELOPE JANE GAGE MILLER | Trustee | 19 March 2009 |
|
|
||||
JAMES MALT | Trustee | 01 January 2007 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £40.06k | £66.33k | £61.13k | £58.73k | £69.36k | |
|
Total expenditure | £40.73k | £34.93k | £54.69k | £57.85k | £68.58k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 09 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | 09 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 18 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 19 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 28 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 28 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 16 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 16 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 01 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 08 December 2021 | 38 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Association Registered 04 Feb 2016
Charitable objects
THE RESTORATION AND PRESERVATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT OF THE GARDENS OF 4 EARLHAM RD, NORWICH, KNOWN AS THE PLANTATION GARDEN.
Contact information
- Address:
-
9 HEIGHAM ROAD
NORWICH
NR2 3AT
- Phone:
- 07411 933364
- Email:
- chair@plantationgarden.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window