PUSHTOON COMMUNITY CENTRE FOR WOMEN (PCCFW)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Organising and accommodating ladies on happy and bereavement times at the centre
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Birmingham City
Governance
- 18 April 2016: CIO registration
- PCCFW (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
LIAQAT HUSSAIN | Chair | 01 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
bakthyar hussain | Trustee | 10 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
CHAND PARI | Trustee | 01 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
SABER TAMAMMA | Trustee | 01 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
PARVEEN BEGUM | Trustee | 01 January 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.31k | £15.48k | £11.44k | £3.00k | £8.42k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.04k | £2.88k | £4.24k | £2.51k | £4.19k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £8.00k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 15 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 15 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 19 June 2024 | 140 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 19 June 2024 | 140 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 11 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 11 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 16 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 16 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 18 Apr 2016
Charitable objects
THE PURPOSES OF THE CHARITY ARE:- THE RELIEF OF THOSE IN NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS IN THE BORDESLEY GREEN AREA OF BIRMINGHAM IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY WIDOWED WOMEN WHO ARE IN NEED OF ASSISTANCE MEETING THE COSTS OF A POST FAMILY BEREAVEMENT AND FUNERAL ARRANGEMENTS. THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY PROVIDING FAMILIES (WHO ARE ECONOMICALLY AND/OR SOCIALLY DISADVANTAGED) WITHIN THE LOCAL COMMUNITIES OF BORDESLEY GREEN WITH ACCESS AND SUPPORT WITH BASIC LITERACY AND NUMERACY SKILLS. THE ADVANCEMENT OF AMATEUR SPORT IN THE BORDESLEY GREEN AREA (SPORTS BEING SPORTS OR GAMES WHICH PROMOTE HEALTH BY INVOLVING PHYSICAL OR MENTAL SKILL OR EXERTION) IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THE SPORTS OF FOOTBALL, CRICKET AND BADMINTON BY SUCH CHARITABLE MEANS AS THE TRUSTEES SEE FIT (INCLUDING WORKING WITH AND SUPPORTING OTHER SIMILAR SPORTS CHARITIES).
Area of benefit
LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
61 EDMUND ROAD
BIRMINGHAM
B8 1HB
- Phone:
- 07737757650
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window