Financial history The Hive College

Charity number: 1168589
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £2.09m £2.46m £2.94m £2.94m £3.57m
Total expenditure £1.76m £2.08m £2.53m £2.70m £3.12m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £2.43m £2.91m £2.93m £3.49m
Income - Donations and legacies £4.25k £2.28k £4.57k £150 £0
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £2.03m £2.41m £2.87m £2.91m £3.49m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £340 £106 £157 £210 £153
Income - Other £58.27k £39.53k £63.58k £29.13k £78.10k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.76m £2.08m £2.53m £2.70m £3.12m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £6.80k £7.64k £4.45k £4.70k £6.93k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0