Financial history BIG RED BUS CLUB

Charity number: 1170704
Charity reporting is up to date (181 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2019 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023
Total gross income £89.89k £43.01k £113.76k £113.76k £89.56k
Total expenditure £90.01k £70.47k £83.93k £83.93k £114.13k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £45.95k £41.69k £2.61k