MALACHI COMMUNITY TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
For the relief of children and young people who are suffering from conditions of poverty, deprivation, hardship and distress particularly but not exclusively through the provision of workshops, counselling, information, teaching and advice and to provide support services to their families as the trustees think fit.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Birmingham City
- North Somerset
- Sandwell
- Solihull
- Somerset
- Staffordshire
- Worcestershire
Governance
- 23 June 2016: CIO registration
- 18 February 2022: Funds received from 1013687 MALACHI COMMUNITY TRUST
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
GORDON JOHN LEE | Chair | 23 June 2016 |
|
|
||||
KEITH BAGBY | Trustee | 23 June 2016 |
|
|
||||
SIMON AKERS JOBSON | Trustee | 23 June 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £70.21k | £193.55k | £286.81k | £52.62k | £69.02k | |
|
Total expenditure | £70.89k | £127.29k | £195.79k | £105.63k | £57.82k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £92.21k | £169.48k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £3.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 23 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 23 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 02 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 02 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 05 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 05 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 23 Jun 2016
Charitable objects
I) FOR THE RELIEF OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE WHO ARE SUFFERING FROM CONDITIONS OF POVERTY, DEPRIVATION, HARDSHIP AND DISTRESS PARTICULARLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THROUGH THE PROVISION OF WORKSHOPS, COUNSELLING, INFORMATION, TEACHING AND ADVICE AND TO PROVIDE SUPPORT SERVICES TO THEIR FAMILIES AS THE TRUSTEES THINK FIT. II) TO ADVANCE AND PROMOTE THE SPIRITUAL AND MORAL DEVELOPMENT OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE AND DEVELOPMENT OF FAMILY LIFE VALUES AND TO STIMULATE PUBLIC AWARENESS IN THE AREAS OF SOCIAL CONCERN, PARTICULARLY USING TEACHINGS, DRAMA, MUSIC AND PERFORMING ARTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Malachi Community Trust
725 Yardley Wood Road
BIRMINGHAM
B13 0PT
- Phone:
- 0121 441 4556
- Email:
- gordon.lee@malachi.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window