THE PAIN EXCHANGE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Pain Exchange runs a pain management programme including exercise, advice and patient education for those suffering with chronic pain.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Ealing
Governance
- 29 March 2016: CIO registration
- 14 February 2023: Funds received from 1174095 THE HOPE CENTRE COMMUNITY
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SHARON DAWN MORGANS | Chair | 31 March 2016 |
|
|
||||
Audette James | Trustee | 01 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
James Riddiough | Trustee | 01 November 2018 |
|
|||||
sharon Morgans | Trustee | 31 March 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.62k | £7.92k | £6.84k | £5.98k | £13.95k | |
|
Total expenditure | £11.56k | £5.88k | £6.57k | £7.52k | £7.03k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £3.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 19 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 19 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 09 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 09 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 28 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 28 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 18 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 18 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 14 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 14 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 29 Mar 2016
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE TO PROTECT AND PROMOTE THE PHYSICAL AND MENTAL HEALTH OF PERSONS SUFFERING FROM MUSCULOSKELETAL (“MSK”) PAIN AND CONDITIONS, IN PARTICULAR BY THE PROVISION OF PHYSIOTHERAPY PROGRAMMES DIRECTED TOWARDS RELIEF, MANAGEMENT AND PREVENTION.
Area of benefit
LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
St. Dunstans Church Hall
Friars Place Lane
LONDON
W3 7AW
- Phone:
- 07904729646
- Email:
- ADMIN@PAINEXCHANGETEAM.ORG
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window