ROK (REACH OUT 2 KIDS) LTD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
* to provide educational support through mentoring, advice, or assistance to children and young adults from economically or socially disadvantaged backgrounds or for those who are in need of such help as identified by their parents, teachers or tutors to assist them in improving their grades at school, attending higher education or in focusing on their future educational or career objectives;
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 August 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
11 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 14 April 2016: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Andrew Isaac Meso | Trustee | 28 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
MICHELLE EDWARDS | Trustee | 18 December 2015 |
|
|
||||
EDWARD FLOOD | Trustee | 18 December 2015 |
|
|
||||
YIMI YANGYE | Trustee | 18 December 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/08/2019 | 05/08/2020 | 05/08/2021 | 05/08/2022 | 05/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £192 | £33 | £8.50k | £37.74k | £65.83k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.11k | £1.86k | £5.06k | £33.18k | £43.39k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 August 2023 | 30 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 August 2023 | 30 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 August 2022 | 30 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 August 2022 | 27 July 2023 | 52 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 August 2021 | 26 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 August 2020 | 09 June 2021 | 4 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 August 2019 | 05 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 August 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 05 AUG 2011 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 22 OCT 2015
Charitable objects
TO ACT AS A RESOURCE FOR CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE BETWEEN THE AGE OF 11 - 18 ACROSS THE UNITED KINGDOM BY PROVIDING ADVICE AND ASSISTANCE AND ORGANISING PROGRAMMES OF EDUCATIONAL AND OTHER ACTIVITIES AS A MEANS OF: (A) ADVANCING IN LIFE AND HELPING YOUNG PEOPLE BY DEVELOPING THEIR SKILLS, CAPACITIES AND CAPABILITIES TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY AS INDEPENDENT, MATURE AND RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS; (B) ADVANCING EDUCATION; AND (C) RELIEVING UNEMPLOYMENT.'
Contact information
- Address:
-
COMPANIES MADE SIMPLE
20-22 WENLOCK ROAD
LONDON
N1 7GU
- Phone:
- 07960 146146
- Email:
- INFO@RO2K.CO.UK
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window