MESOPOTAMIA

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We provide aid to those in need,locally or abroad.Aid can be clothing, educational packs, medical aid and whatever we can to support someone through poverty or crisis.We help local families and the homeless with food and essentials. We run The Moses Basket project which provides a baby with a safe place to sleep and suitable clothing for their first months of their lives.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
32 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Other Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England
- Germany
- Greece
- Turkey
Governance
- 22 June 2016: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
RACHEL MILLER | Chair | 02 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
Maureen Thomas | Trustee | 12 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
IBRAHIM OKTAY EMEC | Trustee | 02 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
ian smith | Trustee | 23 February 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £23.89k | £108.16k | £58.79k | £85.44k | £125.14k | |
|
Total expenditure | £23.12k | £87.31k | £76.32k | £84.55k | £111.12k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £46.51k | £6.04k | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 21 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 21 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 21 February 2024 | 16 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 21 February 2024 | 16 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 13 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 13 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 29 March 2022 | 52 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 29 March 2022 | 52 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 06 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 06 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Association Registered 22 Jun 2016
Charitable objects
"THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY (OR FINANCIAL HARDSHIP) ANYWHERE IN THE WORLD BY PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF EDUCATION, TRAINING, HEALTHCARE PROJECTS AND ALL OF THE NECESSARY SUPPORT DESIGNED TO ENABLE INDIVIDUALS TO GENERATE A SUSTAINABLE INCOME AND BE SELF SUFFICIENT"
Contact information
- Address:
-
557 Valley Road
NOTTINGHAM
NG5 1JE
- Phone:
- 01159780444
- Email:
- mesopotamia.org@outlook.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window