THETFORD CHURCH OF THE NAZARENE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Thetford Church Of The Nazarene conducts regular services for public worship, prayer, Bible study, preaching and teaching for all age groups, and provides pastoral care to the sick and elderly of the church through visitation and prayer.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2020
People

8 Trustee(s)
12 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Religious Activities
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Norfolk
- Suffolk
Governance
- 02 March 2016: CIO registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Tracey Karen Day | Chair | 17 December 2017 |
|
|
||||
Howard Brian Truscott | Trustee | 26 April 2020 |
|
|||||
Helen Morag Truscott | Trustee | 26 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
DAVID MARK DAY | Trustee | 10 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
ALAN JOHN DONNELLY BSC | Trustee | 02 March 2016 |
|
|
||||
JEAN ROSEMARY DONNELLY BSC | Trustee | 02 March 2016 |
|
|
||||
MARY-JANE WELHAM BA | Trustee | 02 March 2016 |
|
|||||
PAUL KENNETH WELHAM BA HONS | Trustee | 02 March 2016 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2016 | 30/09/2017 | 30/09/2018 | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £10.53k | £23.42k | £40.04k | £44.81k | £56.59k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.36k | £20.87k | £50.09k | £51.94k | £44.17k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | £0 | £300 | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 299 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 299 days | |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 665 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 665 days | |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1030 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1030 days | |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 29 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1395 days | |
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 01 August 2020 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | 01 August 2020 | 2 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Association Registered 02 Mar 2016
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH AS PART OF THE CHURCH OF THE NAZARENE INC AND THE DISTRICT PRINCIPALLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY IN NORTHERN ENGLAND.
Area of benefit
LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
43 Abinger Way
Eaton
Norwich
NR4 6ND
- Phone:
- 01603505497
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window