WARRENT OFFICERS' AND SARGEANTS' MESS (WOS' & SGT'S MESS) FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Sgts' Mess is for the good and benefit of the serving soldiers and their families within Blandford Garrison.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

1 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Armed Forces/emergency Service Efficiency
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Other Finance
- Other Charitable Activities
- Dorset
Governance
- 19 January 2016: Standard registration
- WO'S AND SGTS' MESS (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Paul Williams Lt Col | Trustee | 11 September 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £139.86k | £55.62k | £160.36k | £150.49k | £179.82k | |
|
Total expenditure | £124.53k | £58.48k | £156.29k | £154.44k | £148.36k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 16 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 16 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 17 July 2024 | 78 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 21 February 2025 | 297 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 22 June 2023 | 53 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 22 June 2023 | 53 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 17 May 2022 | 17 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 17 May 2022 | 17 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 30 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 30 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 19 MAY 2015
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECT (THE OBJECT) IS 'THE PROMOTION OF EFFICIENCY OF THE ARMED FORCES OF THE CROWN BY THE PROVISION AND SUPPORT OF FACILITIES AND ACTIVITIES FOR THE EFFICIENCY AND WELL-BEING OF SERVICE PERSONNEL'.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Ministry of Defence
Royal School of Signals
Blandford Camp
BLANDFORD FORUM
DT11 8RH
- Phone:
- 01258 482842
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window