Trustees LE PETIT CLUB FRANCAIS D'OXFORDSHIRE
Charity number: 1168486

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Claire de Wambrechies | Trustee | 18 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sophie Jegouic-Goodall | Trustee | 27 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Celine Cornereau | Trustee | 27 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Delphine Elbes | Trustee | 24 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Clotilde Levecque | Trustee | 05 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Patricia Cawte-Dutheil | Trustee | 03 December 2018 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.