ROTARY CLUB OF WOKINGHAM'S CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The relief of the poor and those in need by reason of youth, age,ill health, disability, financial hardship or other disadvantage or such other charitable purposes as the Rotary Club of Wokingham (The Club) shall in duly constituted meetings from time to time direct.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
Total income includes £1 from 1 government grant(s)
People

4 Trustee(s)
40 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Bracknell Forest
- Reading
- Wokingham
Governance
- 02 June 2016: CIO registration
- 02 May 2019: Funds received from 1023466 ROTARY CLUB OF WOKINGHAM TRUST FUND
No other names
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Stephen John Roper | Chair | 31 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
James Berkeley | Trustee | 01 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Gregor Johnston | Trustee | 01 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Michael Wellington | Trustee | 30 June 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.79k | £5.74k | £13.99k | £14.35k | £14.35k | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.26k | £4.76k | £8.62k | £17.79k | £17.79k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £1 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 13 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 13 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 19 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 19 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 06 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 06 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 11 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 11 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 15 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 15 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 02 Jun 2016
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF THE POOR AND THOSE IN NEED BY REASONS OF YOUTH, AGE, ILL HEALTH, DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SUCH OTHER DISADVANTAGE OR SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE ROTARY CLUB OF WOKINGHAM (THE CLUB) SHALL IN DULY CONSTITUTED MEETING FROM TIME TO TIME DIRECT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
LAVENDALE HOUSE
BROOMFIELD PARK
ASCOT
SL5 0JS
- Phone:
- 01344624032
- Website:
-
rotaryclubwokingham.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window