Financial history ACTION HUNGER

Charity number: 1168246
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 15/02/2017 15/02/2018 15/02/2019 15/02/2020 15/02/2021
Total gross income £19.78k £4.62k £41.23k £49.82k £0
Total expenditure £463 £6.05k £58.09k £518 £32.22k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A