11TH EASTBOURNE (ST RICHARD'S) LANGNEY SCOUT GROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide Scout training and activities in the Eastbourne area
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

10 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Other Charitable Activities
- East Sussex
Governance
- 20 June 2016: Standard registration
- 11TH EASTBOURNE (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Charlotte Punchard | Chair | 17 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ross Putland | Trustee | 12 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Natalie Gillian Voce | Trustee | 23 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Natalie Fisher | Trustee | 22 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Penelope Laycock | Trustee | 22 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Timothy Stephen Coombes | Trustee | 17 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Mark Richard Osborne | Trustee | 17 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Duncan Scott Lawson | Trustee | 19 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Laura Michelle Putland | Trustee | 19 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
MRS N FALLON | Trustee | 08 May 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £29.49k | £11.93k | £23.85k | £27.79k | £28.87k | |
|
Total expenditure | £27.01k | £11.60k | £24.72k | £24.43k | £24.62k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 21 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 21 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 18 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 18 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 15 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 22 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 15 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 15 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
ROYAL CHARTER GRANTED 11 MAY 2015
Charitable objects
THE PROGRAMME IN SCOUTING HAS A FUNDAMENTAL DIMENSION, WHICH DETERMINES HOW IT IS CARRIED OUT. THIS IS THE SCOUT PROGRAMME METHOD: KEEPING THE PROMISE AND SCOUT LAW COMMUNITY ACTION HAVING FUN MEETING NEW PEOPLE, MAKING FRIENDS AND DEVELOPING RELATIONSHIPS SPENDING TIME OUTDOORS GAMES, PHYSICAL AND ADVENTUROUS ACTIVITIES DESIGN AND CREATIVITY VISITS AND VISITORS CAMPS, SLEEPOVERS, INTERNATIONAL TRIPS AND OTHER RESIDENTIAL EXPERIENCES WORKING IN SMALL TEAMS TRYING NEW THINGS, AND LEARNING NEW SKILLS TEAMBUILDING AND LEADERSHIP ACTIVITIES TAKING RESPONSIBILITY, GIVING IDEAS AND OPINIONS, MAKING CHOICES AND DECISIONS SPIRITUAL REFLECTION FINDING OUT ABOUT THEMSELVES. SCOUTING EXISTS TO ACTIVELY ENGAGE AND SUPPORT YOUNG PEOPLE IN THEIR PERSONAL DEVELOPMENT, EMPOWERING THEM TO MAKE A POSITIVE CONTRIBUTION TO SOCIETY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Scout Association
Priory Road
EASTBOURNE
East Sussex
BN23 7AX
- Phone:
- 07921 917 591
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window