GOOD CHANCE THEATRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We use the power of theatre to change lives and change minds. With displaced artists centre-stage, we bring people together through theatre and art to create surprising stories that spark new conversations and encourage action on complex urgent issues of our time; migration, climate crisis and polarisation. We have delivered 550 events globally and reached 1.1m audience members and participants.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income:
£1,276,361
Donations and legacies | £682.55k | |
Charitable activities | £590.78k | |
Other trading activities | £101 | |
Investments | £2.93k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£1,120,340
Raising funds | £14.39k | |
Charitable activities | £1.11m | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £14.39k | |
Charitable expenditure | £1.11m | |
Retained for future use | £156.02k |
People

8 Employee(s)
10 Trustee(s)
12 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Barnsley
- Birmingham City
- Coventry City
- Kent
- Manchester City
- Oxfordshire
- Sheffield City
- Throughout London
- Belgium
- France
- Germany
- Greece
- Italy
- Mexico
- Netherlands
- Scotland
- Switzerland
- Turkey
- United States
Governance
- 29 April 2016: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Stephen Daldry | Chair | 14 January 2016 |
|
|||||
Hiran Abeysekera | Trustee | 05 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Phoebe Elisabeth Reith | Trustee | 09 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Gemma White | Trustee | 27 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Majid Akhondzadeh-Darjazi Mr | Trustee | 10 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jeffrey Culpepper | Trustee | 16 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Susan Witherow | Trustee | 21 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Anirudh Mathur | Trustee | 13 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Natalia Kaliada | Trustee | 04 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
SONIA FRIEDMAN | Trustee | 14 January 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £774.46k | £1.20m | £1.90m | £1.75m | £1.28m | |
|
Total expenditure | £738.08k | £1.08m | £2.10m | £1.75m | £1.12m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £136.20k | £20.00k | £11.69k | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £607.43k | £1.16m | £1.81m | £525.12k | £682.55k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £8.84k | £756 | £3.22k | £610 | £101 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £158.13k | £13.34k | £87.40k | £1.22m | £590.78k | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £60 | £19 | £10 | £396 | £2.93k | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £20.63k | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £730.90k | £1.08m | £2.06m | £1.75m | £1.11m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £7.18k | £853 | £35.68k | £5.67k | £14.39k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £0 | £0 | £14.52k | £19.11k | £21.14k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £7.47k | £10.40k | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £6.13k | £3.07k | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £533.67k | £626.82k | £464.80k | £1.17m | £1.75m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £40.60k | £12.10k | £41.66k | £753.88k | £1.17m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 13 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 13 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 24 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 24 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 19 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 19 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 03 November 2022 | 276 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 03 November 2022 | 276 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 23 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 23 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 15 JAN 2016 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 20 APR 2016
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE EDUCATION IN THE ARTS, INCLUDING THE ARTS OF DRAMA, MIME, DANCE AND SINGING, PARTICULARLY BY FACILITATING PARTICIPATION BY THOSE WHO ARE SOCIALLY EXCLUDED (INCLUDING BUT NOT LIMITED TO REFUGEES AND DISPLACED PEOPLE). TO PROMOTE EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY PROMOTING ACTIVITIES TO FOSTER UNDERSTANDING BETWEEN PEOPLE FROM DIVERSE BACKGROUNDS AND CULTIVATE A SENTIMENT IN FAVOUR OF EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY. THE PROMOTION OF HUMAN RIGHTS (AS SET OUT IN THE UNIVERSAL DECLARATION OF HUMAN RIGHTS AND SUBSEQUENT UN CONVENTIONS AND DECLARATIONS AND WITH PARTICULAR REFERENCE TO ARTICLE 27) BY: (A) PROMOTING RESPECT FOR HUMAN RIGHTS AMONG INDIVIDUALS AND GROUPS AND: (B) RAISING AWARENESS OF HUMAN RIGHTS ISSUES WITHIN THE CONTEXT OF PARTICIPATION IN THE ARTS. FOR THE PURPOSE OF THIS CLAUSE ‘SOCIALLY EXCLUDED’ MEANS BEING EXCLUDED FROM SOCIETY, OR PART OF SOCIETY, AS A RESULT OF BEING A MEMBER OF A SOCIALLY AND ECONOMICALLY DEPRIVED COMMUNITY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
RICH MIX CULTURAL FOUNDATION
35-47 BETHNAL GREEN ROAD
LONDON
E1 6LA
- Phone:
- 02079222922
- Email:
- naomi@goodchance.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window