THE FOWBERRY FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The primary objectives of the charity are: THE LONG TERM PRESERVATION OF THE FOWBERRY MANSION, STABLES, GARDEN HOUSE, WOODLAND, PARKLAND & WILDLIFE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC. PROMOTE FOR THE PUBLICBENEFIT THE APPRECIATION OF FOWBERRY AS A PLACE OF HISTORIC AND ARCHITETURAL INTEREST AND NATURAL BEAUTY
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Accommodation/housing
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Animals
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 13 September 2016: CIO registration
- THE FURBERRY FOUNDATION (Previous name)
- THE GAIA CHARITABLE FOUNDATION (BRITAIN) (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Luke Robert Ford | Trustee | 19 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
CRAIG JOHN MARSHALL | Trustee | 13 September 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £15.75k | £8.22k | £19.13k | £13.21k | £12.96k | |
|
Total expenditure | £16.54k | £22.97k | £18.31k | £15.26k | £23.68k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £16.34k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 12 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 12 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 25 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 25 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 05 November 2022 | 5 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 05 November 2022 | 5 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 01 February 2022 | 93 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 01 February 2022 | 93 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 22 December 2020 | 52 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 22 December 2020 | 52 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 13 Sep 2016 as amended on 31 Oct 2020
Charitable objects
SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT AS ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAWS OF ENGLAND AND WALES AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Fowberry Tower
WOOLER
Northumberland
NE71 6ER
- Phone:
- 07875400898
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window