NEWARK & DISTRICT COMMUNITY FIRST RESPONDERS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We are a team of dedicated volunteers who respond to 999 calls within the area of Newark & District, we can potentially save lives. Because we're local, we can arrive at the patients home before the ambulance or paramedic and then we are able to provide essential treatment at the earliest opportunity. We stay with the patient until the ambulance or paramedic arrives - which can be several hours.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
Total income includes £242 from 1 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
12 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Nottinghamshire
Governance
- 16 February 2016: CIO registration
- NEWARK & DISTRICT CFR (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Judith Patrica Kemp | Chair | 02 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Brian Everitt | Trustee | 23 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
John Heald | Trustee | 10 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Mark Ian Housley | Trustee | 01 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jan-Christian Zaluski | Trustee | 02 October 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £10.55k | £8.04k | £2.95k | £855 | £347 | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.32k | £7.78k | £1.60k | £2.05k | £3.95k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £4.23k | £2.23k | N/A | £242 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 02 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 02 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 26 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 26 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 03 May 2023 | 3 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 03 May 2023 | 3 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 10 May 2022 | 10 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 10 May 2022 | 10 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 05 April 2022 | 340 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 05 April 2022 | 340 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 16 Feb 2016
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE EMERGENCY AID AND SUPPORT TO THE COMMUNITIES WITHIN NEWARK AND DISTRICT AND THE SURROUNDING AREAS IN RESPONSE TO 999 CALLS.TO PROVIDE TRAINED VOLUNTEERS TO ATTEND MEDICAL EMERGENCIES AS DIRECTED BY EAST MIDLANDS AMBULANCE SERVICE NHS TRUST OR ITS SUCCESSORS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
17 Peterborough Road
Collingham
NEWARK
Nottinghamshire
NG23 7SP
- Phone:
- 07809 483230
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window