Financial history BRITISH INDIAN PSYCHIATRIC ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1169838
Charity reporting is up to date (67 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £5.77k £4.18k £15.47k £32.01k £48.82k
Total expenditure £9.54k £2.37k £18.15k £25.42k £31.02k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A