BRITISH INDIAN PSYCHIATRIC ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Improve mental health awareness. Organise educational and training events in mental health for benefit of public. Engage in charitable activities in U.K. and India.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
- Australia
- India
- Scotland
Governance
- 21 October 2016: CIO registration
- BIPA (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SRIDEVI SIRA MAHALINGAPPA | Chair | 01 June 2022 |
|
|||||
Dr Fabida Aria | Trustee | 30 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Shweta Mittal | Trustee | 30 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Harinder Singh Bains | Trustee | 30 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Bhavana Chawda | Trustee | 02 October 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.77k | £4.18k | £15.47k | £32.01k | £48.82k | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.54k | £2.37k | £18.15k | £25.42k | £31.02k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 08 April 2025 | 67 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 08 April 2025 | 67 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 07 November 2024 | 281 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 07 November 2024 | 281 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 20 April 2023 | 79 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 20 April 2023 | 79 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 14 July 2022 | 164 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 14 July 2022 | 164 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 30 March 2021 | 58 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 30 March 2021 | 58 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 21 Oct 2016
Charitable objects
TO PROTECT AND PROMOTE GOOD HEALTH FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT AMONG PEOPLE WITH MENTAL ILLNESS OR INTELLECTUAL DISABILITY, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY PEOPLE FROM BME COMMUNITIES, BY: A) ADVANCING EDUCATION IN MENTAL HEALTH AND INTELLECTUAL DISABILITY AND UNDERTAKING TRAINING AND PROMOTING RESEARCH, THE USEFUL RESULTS OF WHICH WILL BE PUBLISHED. B) WORKING WITH STATUTORY BODIES, HEALTHCARE PROFESSIONALS AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS TO ASSIST IN THE IMPROVEMENT OF MENTAL HEALTHCARE PROVISION.
Contact information
- Address:
-
SHAH & CO ACCOUNTANTS LTD
UNIT 1
CASH'S BUSINESS CENTRE
WIDDRINGTON RD
COVENTRY
CV1 4PB
- Phone:
- 01234 350 885
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window