Financial history 5 REGT RA

Charity number: 1165498
Charity reporting is overdue by 369 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022
Total gross income £156.51k £169.83k £87.58k £76.85k £123.68k
Total expenditure £151.45k £159.86k £85.90k £64.45k £135.97k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A