ST MARTIN'S COMMUNITY CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The community centre continues to be widely utilized by the community and neighbouring residents. The community centre hires out the main hall which accomodates up to 100 people, two meeting rooms for training and courses, a multi-purpose creche room. It also has two fully equipped kitchens, two storage rooms for equipment and a large garden to the side of the building.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Accommodation/housing
- Religious Activities
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Lambeth
Governance
- 24 May 2016: Standard registration
- SMCC (Working name)
- ST MARTIN'SCOMMUNITY CENTRE (Previous name)
- ST-MARTINS COMMUNITY CENTRE (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JENNIFER FELIX | Chair | 24 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
JASMINE EUSELL | Trustee | 10 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Paulette Walker | Trustee | 10 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Shelia Vaughan | Trustee | 10 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
MARGUERITA GLORIA ALEXANDER | Trustee | 24 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
TERENCE CURTIS | Trustee | 24 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
AFRYEA ADOFO | Trustee | 24 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
STEPHEN EUSELL | Trustee | 14 April 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £91.69k | £65.46k | £86.20k | £92.03k | £107.86k | |
|
Total expenditure | £86.93k | £54.19k | £79.58k | £100.00k | £114.40k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 28 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 28 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 06 February 2024 | 6 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 06 February 2024 | 6 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 28 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 28 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 22 June 2021 | 142 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 22 June 2021 | 142 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 29 MAY 2002
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY OBJECTS TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF ST MARTIN'S ESTATE AND THE SURROUNDING AREA (TOGETHER CALLED THE AREA OF BENEFIT) BY THE RELIEF OF PROVERTY, DISTRESS AND SICKNESS, THE FURTHERANCE OF HEALTH, THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND THE PROVISION OF RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME FACILITIES IN THE INTREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
St. Martins Community Centre
Abbots Park
London
SW2 3QB
- Phone:
- 02086743038
- Email:
- st-martins@btconnect.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window