Financial history FRIENDS OF RIVERSIDE PARK - CHESTER-LE-STREET

Charity number: 1168443
Charity reporting is up to date (265 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2019 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023
Total gross income £30 £750 £0 £2 £0
Total expenditure £20 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £500 N/A N/A N/A