FRIENDS OF RIVERSIDE PARK - CHESTER-LE-STREET

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote for the benefit of inhabitants of Chester le Street and the surrounding areas, without distinction of sex, sexual orientation, race or of political, religious or other opinions, the provision of facilities for recreation or other leisure time occupation of individuals who have need for such facilities within the context of the Riverside Park, Chester le Street, County Durham.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Recreation
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Durham
Governance
- 26 July 2016: CIO registration
- FORP - CLS (Working name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jeffrey Murphy | Chair | 12 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
Audrey Willis | Trustee | 20 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
CLARE TODD | Trustee | 26 July 2016 |
|
|||||
PAUL EVANS | Trustee | 26 July 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £30 | £750 | £0 | £2 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £20 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £500 | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 20 February 2025 | 265 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 20 February 2025 | 265 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 31 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 31 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 30 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 30 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 25 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 25 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 31 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | 31 May 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Association Registered 26 Jul 2016
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF INHABITANTS OF CHESTER LE STREET AND THE SURROUNDING AREAS, WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, RACE OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED FOR SUCH FACILITIES WITHIN THE CONTEXT OF THE RIVERSIDE PARK, CHESTER LE STREET, COUNTY DURHAM
Contact information
- Address:
-
34 Arundel Walk
Pelton
CHESTER LE STREET
County Durham
DH2 1JD
- Phone:
- 07939295704
- Email:
- secretaryclsforp@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window