KEYNSHAM MUSIC FESTIVAL ASSOCIATION LTD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
As per the Company Articles: The advancement of the arts for the public benefit, in particular but not exclusively, music, dance, art, film and theatre through the organisation and delivery of an annual music festival in the town of Keynsham.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £29,500 from 1 government grant(s)
People

14 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Bath And North East Somerset
Governance
- 15 November 2016: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MICHAEL MAY | Chair | 27 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
Joanne Meredith | Trustee | 18 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Martin Burton | Trustee | 04 June 2024 |
|
|||||
Alan Greenfield | Trustee | 18 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Steven Gibbons | Trustee | 18 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Caitlin Brennan | Trustee | 31 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
JUDITH CRON | Trustee | 28 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW WAIT | Trustee | 28 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
SHEILA WHITTLE | Trustee | 28 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
JOHN ALDRIDGE | Trustee | 28 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
RICHARD WEYMOUTH | Trustee | 27 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
David Biddleston | Trustee | 26 April 2017 |
|
|||||
PATRICIA VEALE | Trustee | 16 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
SUSAN-ANNE PAULLEY | Trustee | 14 November 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £86.03k | £7.71k | £21.59k | £77.30k | £118.32k | |
|
Total expenditure | £89.35k | £7.42k | £20.61k | £92.27k | £102.76k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £18.00k | N/A | £18.00k | £27.00k | £29.50k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 15 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 15 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 10 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 10 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 10 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 27 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 23 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 23 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 12 APR 2012 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 27 NOV 2015 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 06 OCT 2016
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE ARTS FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, MUSIC, DANCE, ART, FILM AND THEATRE THROUGH THE ORGANISATION AND DELIVERY OF AN ANNUAL MUSIC FESTIVAL IN THE TOWN OF KEYNSHAM.
Area of benefit
KEYNSHAM
Contact information
- Address:
-
KEYNSHAM MUSIC FESTIVAL
15 -17 TEMPLE STREET
KEYNSHAM
BRISTOL
BS31 1HF
- Phone:
- 01179868683
- Email:
- info@keynshamfest.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window