NAMDHARI SIKH SANGAT UK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The objectives of the charity for this first year have been to support each individual Namdhari Sikh Charities in the UK. Advance Sikh Religion through facilitating prayer gatherings, public celebration of religious festivals, lectures on Sikh History. Administer Amrit, promote Classical music and wellbeing. Prohibit alcohol and drug consumption, smoking and meat eating.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
200 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 23 August 2016: Standard registration
- 09 January 2019: Funds received from 516560 NAMDHARI SANGAT
- 09 January 2019: Funds received from 268305 NAMDHARI SIKH SANGAT UK
- 09 January 2019: Funds received from 1092824 NAMDHARI SIKH SANGAT SOUTHALL
- 09 January 2019: Funds received from 1117808 NAMDHARI SIKH COMMUNITY LEICESTER
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Harminder Singh Chana | Chair | 23 August 2016 |
|
|
||||
Rashpal Singh Bhatti | Trustee | 19 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
Gurmukh Singh Roopra | Trustee | 23 August 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2020 | 31/01/2021 | 31/01/2022 | 31/01/2023 | 31/01/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £249.76k | £198.29k | £198.29k | £246.09k | £200.49k | |
|
Total expenditure | £138.31k | £100.73k | £100.73k | £167.31k | £247.03k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2024 | 04 December 2024 | 4 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2024 | 04 December 2024 | 4 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2023 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2023 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2022 | 22 February 2023 | 84 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2022 | 22 February 2023 | 84 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2021 | 17 December 2021 | 17 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2021 | 17 December 2021 | 17 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2020 | 30 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2020 | 30 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 13 JAN 2016
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CHARITY IS FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT TO ADVANCE THE SIKH RELIGION AS PRACTICED BY THE NAMDHARI SIKHS THROUGHOUT ENGLAND AND WALES, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY: (A) PROVIDING AND MAINTAINING PLACES FOR PUBLIC RELIGIOUS WORSHIP; (B) PROVIDING, ARRANGING AND CONDUCTING RELIGIOUS SERVICES, AMRIT (BAPTISM), MARRIAGES, CREMATIONS, OTHER LIFECYCLE EVENTS AND THE CELEBRATION OF GURPURUBS (RELIGIOUS FESTIVALS); AND (C) UNDERTAKING SUCH OTHER RELIGIOUS, EDUCATIONAL, RECREATIONAL AND OTHER CHARITABLE ACTIVITIES AS THE TRUSTEES MAY DECIDE IN FURTHERANCE OF THE OBJECT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Namdhari Centre
6 Balfour Business Centre
Balfour Road
SOUTHALL
UB2 5BD
- Phone:
- 07834946242
- Email:
- harminder_chana@hotmail.com
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window