DERBY U3A

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The advancement of education, and in particular the education of older people and those who are retired from full-time work by all means, including associated activities conducive to learning and personal development.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
100 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Recreation
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Human Resources
- Derby City
- Derbyshire
Governance
- 05 February 2016: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Richard Sherratt | Chair | 28 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Barry Appleby | Trustee | 27 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Debbie Wright | Trustee | 17 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Alison Pearcy | Trustee | 25 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Susan Swain | Trustee | 31 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jacqueline Gill | Trustee | 31 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Timms | Trustee | 21 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Liz Lockwood | Trustee | 19 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Rosemary Elaine Wright | Trustee | 28 March 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.44k | £5.91k | £21.60k | £30.49k | £32.96k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.99k | £5.48k | £17.19k | £24.47k | £28.30k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 28 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | 28 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 09 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 09 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 20 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 05 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 15 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 26 MAR 2015 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 12 JUL 2018 as amended on 25 Mar 2021 as amended on 31 Oct 2024
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND, IN PARTICULAR, THE EDUCATION OF OLDER PEOPLE AND THOSE WHO ARE RETIRED FROM FULL TIME WORK, BY ALL MEANS INCLUDING ASSOCIATED ACTIVITIES CONDUCIVE TO LEARNING AND PERSONAL DEVELOPMENT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
55 Kyle Road
Hilton
DERBY
DE65 5JY
- Phone:
- 07490 534271
- Email:
- derbyu3a@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window