THE ELENA BALTACHA FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Foundation offers affordable tennis programmes and a comprehensive parent and player education programme throughout Ipswich, committing to schools from disadvantaged areas. The Foundation delivers free sessions in schools to pupils who otherwise may not have been exposed to the benefits of tennis.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

10 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Essex
- Suffolk
- Throughout London
Governance
- 16 February 2016: CIO registration
- 07 July 2016: Funds received from 1148532 THE ELENA BALTACHA FOUNDATION
- EBAT (Previous name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Kari Chaudhry | Trustee | 17 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Carmichael Brown | Trustee | 07 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Graham Dove | Trustee | 10 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Ferrar | Trustee | 10 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Praf Vagh | Trustee | 10 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Penelope Moor | Trustee | 10 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
CARMELO SEVERINO | Trustee | 12 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Benjamin John Haining | Trustee | 12 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
STEPHEN MICHAEL HARDING | Trustee | 12 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Duncan Foster | Trustee | 26 January 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £29.45k | £24.25k | £23.13k | £4.90k | £33.47k | |
|
Total expenditure | £34.48k | £20.85k | £19.39k | £9.35k | £26.51k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £2.75k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 27 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 27 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 01 February 2022 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 01 February 2022 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION REGISTERED 16 FEB 2016 AMENDED ON 15 AUG 2016
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: (1) TO PROMOTE COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION IN PARTICULAR BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR THE PLAYING OF TENNIS FOR YOUNG PEOPLE. (2) TO ADVANCE IN LIFE AND HELP YOUNG PEOPLE THROUGH THE PROVISION OF RECREATIONAL AND LEISURE TIME ACTIVITIES PROVIDED IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE, DESIGNED TO IMPROVE THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE. (3) THE PROVISION AND ADMINISTRATION OF GRANTS MONIES, SERVICES OR OTHER PROVISIONS, TO INDIVIDUALS, ORGANISATIONS OR OTHER ENTITIES, IN FURTHERANCE AND FULFILMENT OF THE ABOVE OBJECTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
186 Rushmere Road
IPSWICH
IP4 3LP
- Phone:
- 07765778115
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window