Financial history BRAMHOPE ROLLING SCONES WOMEN'S INSTITUTE

Charity Number: 1165554
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £13.03k £7.12k £8.81k £19.28k £14.32k
Total expenditure £12.13k £6.82k £7.19k £19.60k £15.46k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A