BRAMHOPE ROLLING SCONES WOMEN'S INSTITUTE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
As a Womens' Institude we run monthly meetings for our members as well as educational outings and groups for example walking , gardening, Book, Art and Craft
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

10 Trustee(s)
8 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableOne or more of the employees were formerly trustees
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Other Defined Groups
- Other Charitable Activities
- Leeds City
Governance
- 12 February 2016: Standard registration
- BRAMHOPE WI (Working name)
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SUE HENRY | Chair | 14 November 2013 |
|
|
||||
Melanie Winstanley | Trustee | 02 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Judith Knox | Trustee | 02 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Christine Flack-Crane | Trustee | 11 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Susan Fishburn | Trustee | 11 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Diane Jackson | Trustee | 11 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Kim Skirrow | Trustee | 12 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Judith Ralph | Trustee | 11 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
Jean Jolly | Trustee | 17 February 2016 |
|
|
||||
JUNE AVIS TOOVEY | Trustee | 14 November 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £13.03k | £7.12k | £8.81k | £19.28k | £14.32k | |
|
Total expenditure | £12.13k | £6.82k | £7.19k | £19.60k | £15.46k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 02 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 02 November 2023 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 12 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 07 November 2021 | 7 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 08 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 14 NOV 2014
Charitable objects
TO FURTHER THE PURPOSES OF THE WOMEN'S INSTITUTE ORGANISATION.
Contact information
- Address:
-
32 OLD LANE
BRAMHOPE
LEEDS
LS16 9AZ
- Phone:
- 01132842113
- Email:
- bramhopewi@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window