Trustees BRAMHOPE ROLLING SCONES WOMEN'S INSTITUTE
Charity number: 1165554

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SUE HENRY | Chair | 14 November 2013 |
|
|
||||
Melanie Winstanley | Trustee | 02 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Judith Knox | Trustee | 02 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Christine Flack-Crane | Trustee | 11 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Susan Fishburn | Trustee | 11 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Diane Jackson | Trustee | 11 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Kim Skirrow | Trustee | 12 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Judith Ralph | Trustee | 11 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
Jean Jolly | Trustee | 17 February 2016 |
|
|
||||
JUNE AVIS TOOVEY | Trustee | 14 November 2013 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.