COVENTRY DAY CENTRE FOR THE HOMELESS LIMITED
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charitable object of Coventry Day Centre for the Homeless is to join together with statutory and voluntary agencies to administer a Day Centre for the use, rest, recreation, leisure time, social and other needs of homeless and rootless people
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2007
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Coventry City
Governance
- 19 April 1978: Standard registration
- 20 July 2009: Removed (Funds transferred (gi))
- 20 July 2009: Funds transferred to 502421 COVENTRY CYRENIANS LIMITED
- NORTON HOUSE (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2007 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £177.14k | |
|
Total expenditure | £179.51k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2008 | 02 January 2009 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2007 | 09 October 2008 | 252 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2007 | 24 August 2007 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2006 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2006 | 20 August 2007 | 201 days late | |
Annual return | 31 March 2005 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2005 | Not submitted |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 30 NOVEMBER 1977
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF SINGLE HOMELESS PERSONS (HEREINAFTER CALLED THE BENEFICIARIES) WHO ARE IN NECESSITOUS CIRCUMSTANCES, IN ANY MANNER WHO NOW ARE OR HEREAFTER MAY BE DEEMED BY LAW TO BE CHARITABLE AND, IN PARTICULAR, BY ASSOCIATING THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES AND VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO PROVIDE, ADMINISTER AND MANAGE A DAY CENTRE FOR THE USE, REST, RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING CONDITIONS AND LIFE OF THE BENEFICIARIES.
Area of benefit
COVENTRY
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window