3RD SECTOR ASSIST LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The organisation will have available and provide, subsidised accommodation to include storage units, offices and workshops that are geared to the needs of and exclusively used by recipient charities, which can be used on an ?easy in?-? easy out? basis. The granting of facilities will be determined by the trustees and dependent on recipient organisations being a charity.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2022
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 29 September 2016: Standard registration
- 3RDSA (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
GEOFF BRIGHT | Chair | 25 November 2015 |
|
|
||||
CLIVE HAWORTH | Trustee | 25 November 2015 |
|
|
||||
PETER MITCHELL | Trustee | 08 September 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £799 | £6.27k | £0 | £0 | £1.10k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.12k | £9.80k | £4.68k | £186 | £1.12k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 276 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 276 days | |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 28 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 17 March 2023 | 230 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 01 April 2022 | 60 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 16 February 2021 | 16 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 08 SEP 2015 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 15 SEP 2016
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE EFFICIENCY AND EFFECTIVENESS OF CHARITIES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC BY PROVIDING RECIPIENT CHARITIES WITH ACCESS TO SPACE IN OTHERWISE VACANT UNITS ON A NON-COMMERCIAL BASIS
Contact information
- Address:
-
Suite 95
Courthill House
60 Water Lane
Wilmslow
Cheshire
SK9 5AJ
- Phone:
- 01619790656
- Email:
- 3rdsectorassist@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window