GRAVESEND ROWING CLUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Providing facilities for, and education in, the amateur sport of rowing in the district of Gravesham.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

9 Trustee(s)
7 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Kent
Governance
- 17 June 2016: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Madeleine Finlay | Trustee | 01 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Joseph Hinks | Trustee | 01 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Caitlin Johnson | Trustee | 01 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ethan Page | Trustee | 01 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Bradley Smith | Trustee | 31 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Amelia Page | Trustee | 31 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Melissa Stanley | Trustee | 31 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
MATTHEW ROBERT MCLEAN JOHNSON | Trustee | 09 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
STEPHEN CASON | Trustee | 09 December 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £38.27k | £37.00k | £37.59k | £134.62k | £28.96k | |
|
Total expenditure | £42.63k | £15.46k | £32.03k | £33.83k | £39.03k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £500 | £10.00k | £20.69k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 26 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 26 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 12 December 2023 | 135 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 12 December 2023 | 135 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 18 August 2022 | 19 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 18 August 2022 | 19 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 25 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 18 August 2022 | 384 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 22 February 2021 | 207 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | 25 February 2021 | 210 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Association Registered 17 Jun 2016
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS TO PROVIDE FACILITIES FOR, AND TO PROMOTE ACTIVE PARTICIPATION IN, THE AMATEUR SPORT OF ROWING FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE GRAVESHAM DISTRICT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Gravesend Rowing Club
Gordon Promenade
GRAVESEND
Kent
DA12 2BS
- Phone:
- 07855021232
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window