ALLERTON HEBREW CONGREGATION CENTRAL SYNAGOGUE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance the Jewish religion for the public benefit by providing and maintaining a synagogue for prayer, creating social and cultural activities, creating programmes of Jewish learning and education, providing for burial in accordance with the Orthodox tradition, contributing to welfare and charitable purposes in connection with the Jewish religion
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
Total income includes £6,037 from 1 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Liverpool City
Governance
- 18 October 2016: CIO registration
- ALLERTON HEBREW CONGREGATION (Working name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Alan Coleman | Chair | 20 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan David Beck | Trustee | 20 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Steven Paul Alis | Trustee | 20 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
ELLIS ADRIAN HAFT | Trustee | 04 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
Michael Jeffrey Lawrence | Trustee | 19 April 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £196.74k | £151.95k | £160.42k | £177.25k | £198.48k | |
|
Total expenditure | £164.03k | £145.68k | £170.98k | £173.70k | £207.43k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £2.16k | £1.22k | £816 | £1.15k | £6.04k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 05 May 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | 05 May 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 30 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 30 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 04 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 04 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 22 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 22 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 30 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 30 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 18 Oct 2016
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE TO ADVANCE THE JEWISH RELIGION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY ALL OR ANY OF THE FOLLOWING MEANS: 1) TO PROVIDE AND MAINTAIN OF A SYNAGOGUE FOR PRAYER AND TO FURTHER ENCOURAGE THE PRACTICE OF ORTHODOX JUDAISM AS PRESCRIBED BY THE OFFICE OF THE CHIEF RABBI OF THE UNITED HEBREW CONGREGATIONS OF THE COMMONWEALTH 2) TO CREATE AND DEVELOP SOCIAL AND CULTURAL ACTIVITIES FOR ALL AGES FOR ITS MEMBERSHIP AND TO THE WIDER JEWISH COMMUNITY OF LIVERPOOL AND MERSEYSIDE 3) TO CREATE PROGRAMMES OF JEWISH LEARNING AND EDUCATION IN CONJUNCTION WITH OTHER BODIES TO FURTHER AID AND STRENGTHEN THE PRACTICE OF ORTHODOX JUDAISM 4) TO PROVIDE PLOTS AND BURIAL RITES IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE ORTHODOX TRADITION 5) TO CONTRIBUTE TO WELFARE AND CHARITABLE PURPOSES IN CONNECTION WITH THE JEWISH RELIGION
Contact information
- Address:
-
ALLERTON HEBREW CONGREGATION
MALCOLM MALITS COURT
207 MATHER AVENUE
LIVERPOOL
L18 9UB
- Phone:
- 01517244811
- Email:
- admin@allertonshul.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window